0.26*39000-32.4/360*12000/(39000-12000)*100

=10140-1080/270

=33.5

mamta_bisht
asked
in Quantitative Aptitude
Apr 3, 2017

1,876 views
0 votes

I found this question in a quiz made for SBI PO. I found no short way of doing this question rather than only fast calculation. Is it all or we need to solve this question with some trick. Please suggest if any rather then only fast calculation.

**A total of 39 thousand students appeared in an entrance examination from six cities, in which the number of boys was 12000. The following pie-charts show the distribution of the total students and of the total boys from these cities who appeared in the exam.**

**Q1. What is the total number of girls who appeared from City A?**

(a) 3210

(b) 3440

(c) 3650

(d) 3870

(e) 3900

**Q2. What is the difference between the total number of boys and the total number of girls who appeared in the exam from City E?**

(a) 1725

(b) 1750

(c) 1775

(d) 1800

(e) 1825

**Q3. The total number of girls who appeared from City C is approximately what per cent of the total number of students who appeared from City D?**

(a) 45%

(b) 49%

(c) 54%

(d) 57%

(e) 60%

**Q4. What is the difference between the total number of boys who appeared from City A and that from City B?**

(a) 320

(b) 330

(c) 340

(d) 350

(e) 360

**Q5. The number of girls who appeared from City F is approximately what per cent of the total number of girls who appeared from all six cities together?**

(a) 31.5%

(b) 32.5%

(c) 33.5%

(d) 34.5%

(e) 35.5%

0 votes

Best answer

1. Total no. of girls from city A

= Total students from city A - Total boys from city A (assuming no other gender)

= 17/100 * 39000 - 82.8/360 * 12000

= 17 * 390 - 2760

= 6630 - 2760

= 3870

2. 75.6/360 * 12000 - (8.5/100 * 39000 - 75.6/360 * 12000)

= 756/18 * 120 - 85 * 39

= 42 * 120 - 3400 + 85

= 4200 +840 - 3400 + 85

= 1725

3. $\frac{0.15 * 39000 - 61.2/360 * 12000}{0.2 * 39000} * 100$

$= \frac{15* 390 - 2040}{78}$

$= \frac{6000 - 150 - 2040}{78}$

$=\frac{3810}{78}$

$\approx 49$

4. $\frac{82.8 - 72}{360} *12000$

$= 1080*120/360 = 360$

5. $\frac{0.26 * 39000 - 32.4/360 * 12000}{39000-12000} * 100$

$= \frac{26*390 - 1080} {27000}*100$

$= \frac{10400 - 260 - 1080}{270}$

$= \frac{932- 26}{27}$

$= \frac{906}{27}$

$= \frac{302}{9}$

$= 33.5$

= Total students from city A - Total boys from city A (assuming no other gender)

= 17/100 * 39000 - 82.8/360 * 12000

= 17 * 390 - 2760

= 6630 - 2760

= 3870

2. 75.6/360 * 12000 - (8.5/100 * 39000 - 75.6/360 * 12000)

= 756/18 * 120 - 85 * 39

= 42 * 120 - 3400 + 85

= 4200 +840 - 3400 + 85

= 1725

3. $\frac{0.15 * 39000 - 61.2/360 * 12000}{0.2 * 39000} * 100$

$= \frac{15* 390 - 2040}{78}$

$= \frac{6000 - 150 - 2040}{78}$

$=\frac{3810}{78}$

$\approx 49$

4. $\frac{82.8 - 72}{360} *12000$

$= 1080*120/360 = 360$

5. $\frac{0.26 * 39000 - 32.4/360 * 12000}{39000-12000} * 100$

$= \frac{26*390 - 1080} {27000}*100$

$= \frac{10400 - 260 - 1080}{270}$

$= \frac{932- 26}{27}$

$= \frac{906}{27}$

$= \frac{302}{9}$

$= 33.5$